IN SB0115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School employee misconduct. Provides that a policy adopted by a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school with at least one employee addressing expanded criminal history checks or expanded child protection index checks (background checks) must prohibit the hiring of, continuing the employment of, contracting with, or continuing to contract with a person who has been convicted of an offense requiring license revocation, unless the conviction has been reversed, vacated, or set aside on appeal. (Current law provides that such a policy addressing background checks must prohibit the hiring of a person who has been convicted of an offense requiring license revocation, unless the conviction has been reversed, vacated, or set aside on appeal.) Provides that: (1) a school corporation; (2) a charter school; or (3) an entity: (A) with which a school corporation contracts for services; and (B) that has employees who are likely to have direct, ongoing contact with children within the scope of the employees' employment; shall consider whether information obtained from the background checks concerning an individual's conviction for certain offenses constitutes grounds to not employ, not contract with, or to terminate the employment of or contract with the individual. Provides that, in the event that an entity obtains information that an individual employed by the entity who works at a particular school corporation or charter school has been convicted of certain offenses, the entity shall immediately notify the school corporation or charter school of the employee's conviction. Makes changes to the list of offenses for which the department of education shall permanently revoke a teacher's license. Makes conforming changes.
Title
School employee misconduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Rep. John Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 125 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 344: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 353: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Thompson, Ziemke, Klinker and Pfaff |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Young J and Smith V |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crider, Ford J.D. and Bohacek |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Yoder |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Houchin removed as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Crider added as third author |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |