IN SB0115 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
Pending: House Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits an entity authorized to transport carbon dioxide by pipeline to acquire real property by eminent domain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain for carbon dioxide pipeline.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
2010-01-28 Cosponsors: Reps. Koch and Stilwell
2010-01-28 House sponsor: Rep. Battles
2010-01-28 Referred to the House
2010-01-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: Yeas 36 and Nays 12
2010-01-25 Amendment 2 (M. Young), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Amendment 1 (Gard), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-19 Senators Waterman and Hume added as coauthors
2010-01-19 Senator Bray added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback