IN SB0111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Family & Children Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Family & Children Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TANF eligibility. Sets the income eligibility requirements for the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program at phased-in specified percentages of the federal income poverty level. Requires the division of family resources to amend the state TANF plan or take any other action necessary to implement the income requirements. Increases certain payment amounts under the TANF program beginning January 1, 2022. Requires the payments to be annually adjusted using the Social Security cost of living adjustment rate, but provides that the total adjustment in a year must be reduced to the extent the adjustment would result in the transfer to the Child Care and Development Fund grant program being less than the maximum allowable transfer under federal law. Authorizes emergency rulemaking concerning the payments. Repeals language requiring the division of family resources to apply a percentage reduction to the total needs of TANF applicants and recipients in computing TANF benefits.
Title
TANF eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as third author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/111/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/5/c/c35c60d1/SB0111.01.INTR.pdf |