IN SB0108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that when a school corporation authorizes an absence to permit a student to attend any educationally related nonclassroom activity, the student may not be recorded as being absent on any date for which the excuse is operative and may not be penalized by the school. Provides that an initial school improvement plan must be established and approved by the governing body not later than August 1 of the school year in which the plan is to be implemented. Requires: (1) the Indiana education employment relations board (board) to publish a model compensation plan with a model salary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters. Provides that when a school corporation authorizes an absence to permit a student to attend any educationally related nonclassroom activity, the student may not be recorded as being absent on any date for which the excuse is operative and may not be penalized by the school. Provides that an initial school improvement plan must be established and approved by the governing body not later than August 1 of the school year in which the plan is to be implemented. Requires: (1) the Indiana education employment relations board (board) to publish a model compensation plan with a model salary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Klinker) failed (Y: 31 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 228
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2017-04-21HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2017-04-12SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 461: yeas 34, nays 3
2017-04-11SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 423: yeas 79, nays 15
2017-04-04HouseAmendment #2 (Goodin) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04HouseAmendment #4 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04HouseAmendment #3 (Klinker) failed; Roll Call 372: yeas 31, nays 68
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-21SenateCosponsors: Representatives Cook, Smith, V. and Wesco
2017-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2017-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 46, nays 0
2017-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/108/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/9/7/9597b46e/SB0108.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/6/d/6d6d0166/SB0108.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/3/6/80362926/SB0108.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/4/3/e74389dc/SB0108.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/7/a/2f7a1f91/SB0108.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/7/5/4275d19a/SB0108.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/9/e/e79ec1b4/SB0108.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/4/1/9f41f03e/SB0108.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/f/9/cdf9afe6/SB0108.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/c/0/1fc0e9e9/SB0108.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/a/4/2ca46211/SB0108.148.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/a/3/8ca3121c/SB0108.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/2/d/612d67e0/SB0108.372.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/3/7/9c3764c1/SB0108.423.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/8/0/5b809459/SB0108.461.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback