IN SB0107 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a second or third class city to adopt a salary ordinance not later than November 1 (instead of September 30) for the ensuing budget year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deadline for adoption of salary ordinances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 322: yeas 48, nays 0
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 367: yeas 94, nays 0
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-07 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: Thompson, Richardson and V. Smith
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Neese and Moses
2012-02-28 Senate advisor appointed: Lawson
2012-02-28 Senate conferee appointed: Zakas and Hume
2012-02-27 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-02-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 86, nays 3
2012-02-20 Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-20 Amendment 2 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-20 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2012-02-01 House sponsor: Rep. Neese
2012-02-01 Referred to the House
2012-02-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-31 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2012-01-31 Amendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-31 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-26 Senator Broden added as coauthor
2012-01-26 Senator Hume added as third author
2012-01-26 Senator Lawson added as second author
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0107
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/IN/IN0107.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SB/SB0107.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SB/SB0107.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0107.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0107.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SE/SE0107.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0164.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0209.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0367.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0322.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback