IN SB0106 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state board of finance to post a narrative description of all approved transfers of money, and the reason for each transfer, on the Indiana transparency Internet web site. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to develop indicators of fiscal health for school corporations and other political subdivisions. Requires the DLGF to present information for evaluating the fiscal health of political subdivisions on the Indiana transparency Internet web site through conveniently and easily accessed dashboards. Prohibits the department of local government finance and other state agencies from using the fiscal health indicators to assign a school corporation or political subdivision a summative grade. Allows political subdivisions to request technical assistance from the distressed unit appeals board (DUAB) beginning in 2015. Requires the office of management and budget (OMB) to evaluate whether the DUAB requires additional powers and resources to provide technical assistance. Requires the OMB to also evaluate the organizational structure, board composition, and number of board members of the DUAB. Allows the OMB to recommend any legislation necessary to provide those additional powers and resources to the DUAB.
Title
Local government transparency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Rep. Eric Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 010602 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 010601 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 010602 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 010601 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 84 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 411: yeas 44 and nays 1 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 470: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator R. Young removed as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Kersey added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Hale added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Negele added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 274: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 106 Amendment #1 (Porter), prevailed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Turner added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Mahan added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Negele added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Boots added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |