IN SB0105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updated Indiana Drainage Handbook. Requires the state department of agriculture (department) to oversee and take all actions necessary for the preparation and publication of an updated version of the Indiana Drainage Handbook. Authorizes the department to select a contractor to draft the updated version of the Indiana Drainage Handbook. Requires the secretary of agriculture and rural development to appoint an advisory board to advise the contractor and the department and to review and provide non-binding comments on the structure and the text of drafts of the updated Indiana Drainage Handbook. Provides that the advisory board must include representatives of certain organizations and state agencies and may include other members appointed by the secretary of agriculture and rural development.
Title
Updated Indiana Drainage Handbook.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] |
Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. David Abbott [R] | Rep. John Prescott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lindauer, Abbott, Prescott |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Baird |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |
Subjects
AGENCIES; Department of Administration (IDOA)
BOARDS, COMISSIONS, AND COUNCILS; Newly Created
ENVIRONMENT; Drain and Drainage
BOARDS, COMISSIONS, AND COUNCILS; Newly Created
ENVIRONMENT; Drain and Drainage