IN SB0100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonconforming structures. Provides that the parcel owner shall be allowed to reconstruct, repair, or renovate the nonconforming structure if the reconstruction, repair, or renovation meets certain requirements. Specifies that the bill's provision regarding the reconstruction, repair, or renovation of a nonconforming structure does not apply to a nonconforming structure that is: (1) subject to the jurisdiction of a preservation commission; or (2) located within a flood plain.
Title
Nonconforming structures.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 134 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 41, nays 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 74, nays 19 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Stutzman and Pressel |
2020-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |