IN SB0098 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lawsuits against gun manufacturers. Prohibits a person from bringing certain actions against a firearms manufacturer, ammunition manufacturer, trade association, or seller, and makes the prohibition effective upon passage. Prohibits awards for attorney's fees and incurred costs in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawsuits against gun manufacturers. Prohibits a person from bringing certain actions against a firearms manufacturer, ammunition manufacturer, trade association, or seller, and makes the prohibition effective upon passage. Prohibits awards for attorney's fees and incurred costs in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smaltz) prevailed (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenatePublic Law 106
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 483: yeas 37, nays 10
2015-04-20SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 72, nays 24
2015-04-13HouseAmendment #2 (Smaltz) prevailed; Roll Call 409: yeas 75, nays 19
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-10HouseRepresentative Stemler added as cosponsor
2015-03-02HouseRepresentatives Torr and Lucas added as cosponsors
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Smaltz added as sponsor
2015-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 37, nays 11
2015-02-19SenateAmendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-19SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-17SenatePlaced back on second reading
2015-02-17SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2015-02-17SenateSenator Hershman added as coauthor
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateSenators Becker and Messmer added as coauthors
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-10SenateSenator Waltz added as coauthor
2015-02-10SenateSenator Steele added as second author
2015-02-05SenateSenator Tomes added as author
2015-02-05SenateSenator Long removed as author
2015-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/98/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/0/4/2f04b0d2/SB0098.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/a/6/47a67cdb/SB0098.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/b/9/fcb9cfa0/SB0098.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/9/7/04976f96/SB0098.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/c/1/d4c193ac/SB0098.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/7/c/0f7c2e5d/SB0098.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/2/236293e0/SB0098.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/5/8/e25800d2/HB1084.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/3/0/a930ac03/SB0098.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/0/2/3f02033c/SB0098.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/0/7/30070f94/SB0098.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/b/f/3fbfb942/SB0098.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/5/44b59c3c/SB0098.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/d/e/a0de8a5c/SB0098.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/e/b/ffebe7d9/SB0098.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/4/2/6c4226ff/SB0098.205.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/5/4/b654c9cb/SB0098.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/a/0/76a0d387/SB0098.409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/7/b/347b4d25/SB0098.437.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/2/a/a22ae741/SB0098.483.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback