IN SB0096 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Committee report: do pass; reassigned to Utilities
Pending: Senate Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a public utility that provides water service or wastewater service may establish a utility system improvement program (USIP) to recover costs for eligible utility system improvements. (Current law provides for the establishment of a distribution system improvement charge (DSIC), and provides that a DSIC can be established only by a public utility that provides water service.) Specifies that eligible utility system improvements for purposes of a USIP may be, but are not required to be, projects: (1) to replace an existing utility system plant that is aged; or (2) that otherwise constitute a replacement plant. Provides that for purposes of a USIP, a public utility's pretax return includes revenues necessary to pay state utility receipts taxes associated with USIP revenues. Provides that before filing a petition with the utility regulatory commission (IURC) for approval of a USIP, a public utility shall petition the IURC for approval of the public utility's five year plan for eligible utility system improvements. Provides that a public utility that implements a USIP shall, before the expiration of the public utility's approved five year plan, petition the IURC for review and approval of the public utility's basic rates and charges. Provides that the IURC may not approve a USIP to the extent it would produce total USIP revenues exceeding 10% (versus 5% under current law for DSIC revenues) of the public utility's base revenue level approved by IURC in the public utility's most recent general rate proceeding. Requires a public utility to annually reconcile the difference between its USIP revenues and costs. Repeals definitions related to DSICs and makes conforming amendments. Specifies the applicability of these amendments to a public utility that has a

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility system improvement program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 12 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 13 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 000101 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-21SenateCommittee report: do pass; reassigned to Utilities
2014-01-21SenateSenator Long removed as first author.
2014-01-21SenateSenator Merritt added as first author.
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/96/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/e/6/25e64e4f/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/d/9/52d97386/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/9/6/c5966254/SB0001.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/a/b/6fab527e/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/a/c2fae174/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/c/3/cbc3cf27/SB0001.03.COMS.83.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/3/a/d63aa98a/SB0001.02.COMS.50.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/0/4/1304d02b/SB0001.02.COMS.51.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/e/2/cbe2ea9d/SB0001.02.COMS.52.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/7/8/c478241a/SB0001.02.COMS.53.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/2/5/08256026/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback