IN SB0092 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Representative Moed added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Deadly weapons. Specifies offenses that are eligible for a sentencing enhancement if a deadly weapon is used the commission of certain offenses. Provides that a sentence may be enhanced when a deadly weapon is used during the commission of controlled substance offenses. Provides that sentencing enhancements for the possession of a deadly weapon during the commission of an offense may not be suspended. Provides that a person is a habitual offender if the state proves the person has been convicted of three prior unrelated felonies of any level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deadly weapons. Specifies offenses that are eligible for a sentencing enhancement if a deadly weapon is used the commission of certain offenses. Provides that a sentence may be enhanced when a deadly weapon is used during the commission of controlled substance offenses. Provides that sentencing enhancements for the possession of a deadly weapon during the commission of an offense may not be suspended. Provides that a person is a habitual offender if the state proves the person has been convicted of three prior unrelated felonies of any level.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-05SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateRepresentative Frizzell added as cosponsor
2015-02-05SenateRepresentative Speedy added as sponsor
2015-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 43, nays 5
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-15SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as coauthor
2015-01-15SenateSenator Waltz added as third author
2015-01-15SenateSenator Young, M. added as second author
2015-01-14SenateSenator Schneider added as first author
2015-01-14SenateSenator Long removed as first author
2015-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback