IN SB0087 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Multiple county PTABOAs. Provides that the legislative bodies of two or more counties may adopt substantially similar ordinances to establish a multiple county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA). Provides that a multiple county PTABOA must consist of either of the following number of members: (1) Three members, not more than two of whom may be from the same political party. (2) Five members, not more than three of whom may be from the same political party. Provides that the fiscal bodies of the counties that establish a multiple county PTABOA must adopt substantially similar ordinances to appoint the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multiple county PTABOAs. Provides that the legislative bodies of two or more counties may adopt substantially similar ordinances to establish a multiple county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA). Provides that a multiple county PTABOA must consist of either of the following number of members: (1) Three members, not more than two of whom may be from the same political party. (2) Five members, not more than three of whom may be from the same political party. Provides that the fiscal bodies of the counties that establish a multiple county PTABOA must adopt substantially similar ordinances to appoint the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 207
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-01HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-03-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 91, nays 2
2016-02-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2016-01-21SenateCosponsors: Representatives Baird, Smaltz, Bauer
2016-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Price
2016-01-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 48, nays 0
2016-01-19SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-01-19SenateAmendment #1 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-19SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-14SenateSenator Houchin added as second author
2016-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/87/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/6/a/c46a850f/SB0087.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/3/e/793e5ac3/SB0087.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/8/2/a282f59c/SB0087.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/c/d/47cd9275/SB0087.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/e/9/f1e9b572/SB0087.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/4/b/814b5d0c/SB0087.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/1/3/3613afa6/SB0087.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/9/4/80948d95/SB0087.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/4/4/42442dc5/SB0087.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/1/c/5c1c18f7/SB0087.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/c/8/fac88fb4/SB0087.32.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/a/3/eea34c57/SB0087.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/f/3/93f3c024/SB0087.290.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback