IN SB0085 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

1977 fund retirement and surviving spouse benefits. Increases the basic monthly pension benefit payable to a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) who retires after June 30, 2019, with 20 years of service from 50% to 52% of the monthly salary of a first class patrolman or firefighter in the year the member ended active service. Increases from 60% to 70% of the member's monthly benefit the monthly benefit paid to a surviving spouse of a 1977 fund member who dies after June 30, 2019, other than in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

1977 fund retirement and surviving spouse benefits. Increases the basic monthly pension benefit payable to a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) who retires after June 30, 2019, with 20 years of service from 50% to 52% of the monthly salary of a first class patrolman or firefighter in the year the member ended active service. Increases from 60% to 70% of the member's monthly benefit the monthly benefit paid to a surviving spouse of a 1977 fund member who dies after June 30, 2019, other than in the line of duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Law 146
2019-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 538: yeas 44, nays 0
2019-04-18HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 560: yeas 89, nays 0
2019-04-17SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-17HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Leonard, Thompson and Beck
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: VanNatter and Harris
2019-04-04SenateSenate advisors appointed: Niemeyer, Ford J.D., Bohacek and Alting
2019-04-04SenateSenate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Tallian
2019-03-28SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-03-28SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 348: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-03-25HouseRepresentative Morrison added as cosponsor
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRepresentative Harris added as cosponsor
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateSenator Buchanan added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateCosponsor: Representative Aylesworth
2019-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative VanNatter
2019-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateSenator Brown L added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-28SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenators Tallian, Crane, Kruse, Niezgodski added as coauthors
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-15SenateSenator Walker added as coauthor
2019-01-07SenateSenators Bohacek and Alting added as coauthors
2019-01-07SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Ford Jon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/85/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/c/c/91cc24ea/SB0085.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/e/d/46edb9fc/SB0085.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/5/6/d8564d5a/SB0085.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/4/d9c479d5/SB0085.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/4/1/4141b22f/SB0085.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/7/c/297cfca4/SB0085.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/d/2/a0d2c828/SB0085.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/9/c/a79cf4ba/SB0085.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/e/b/f2eb6270/SB0085.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/9/7/ee9761a5/SB0085.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/a/a/25aa80f5/SB0085.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/5/d/825d9bd5/SB0085.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/e/5/abe5369b/SB0085.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/4/2/c8421961/SB0085.74.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/1/e/0f1eba67/SB0085.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/6/c/d36ca74c/SB0085.04.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/b/a/adba8048/SB0085.348.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/4/2/38429acc/SB0085.560.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/b/e/93be7ab0/SB0085.538.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback