IN SB0081 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Training for investigators of sexual assault cases. Requires certain training for sexual assault investigators. Mandates that the law enforcement training board set specialized standards for training and investigating sexual assault cases involving adult victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Training for investigators of sexual assault cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePublic Law 8
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-17SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-16HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-15HouseRepresentatives Schaibley and Engleman added as cosponsors
2021-03-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 96, nays 0
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Davis M added as cosponsor
2021-03-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2021-01-28SenateSenator Baldwin added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Olthoff
2021-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-01-26SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2021-01-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-25SenateSenators Houchin and Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2021-01-25SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2021-01-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/81/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/2/0/88208016/SB0081.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/4/9/1849c2fe/SB0081.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/0/b6307b82/SB0081.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/6/0/5d606246/SB0081.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/a/7/16a7af83/SB0081.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/3/a/6b3ab1ba/SB0081.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/8/5/dc854a08/SB0081.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/3/7cc321b9/SB0081.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/9/f/129f7159/SB0081.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/9/cb995d56/SB0081.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/5/b/a15bb4d1/SB0081.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/f/a/28fa9fb7/SB0081.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/6/a376dbe4/SB0081.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/9/d/109d30ee/SB0081.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/8/55f85fe9/SB0081.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/d/a/f0da79e8/SB0081.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/a/7/52a74e55/SB0081.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/5/9/2659dd66/SB0081.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/2/3/0f235d72/SB0081.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/7/e/8a7e0d01/SB0081.26_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/7/8/7d78e9b5/SB0081.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/c/5/51c5534a/SB0081.257_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback