IN SB0080 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deferred retirement option plan disability benefit. Revises, for a member of the 1925 police pension fund, the 1937 firefighters' pension fund, the 1953 police pension fund, or the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund who retires after June 30, 2017, because of a disability at least 12 months after the date the member enters the deferred retirement option plan (DROP), the calculation of the retirement benefit paid to the member. Allows a member who retired after January 1, 2015, and before July 1, 2017, because of a disability at least 12 months after the date the member
Title
Deferred retirement option plan disability benefit. Revises, for a member of the 1925 police pension fund, the 1937 firefighters' pension fund, the 1953 police pension fund, or the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund who retires after June 30, 2017, because of a disability at least 12 months after the date the member enters the deferred retirement option plan (DROP), the calculation of the retirement benefit paid to the member. Allows a member who retired after January 1, 2015, and before July 1, 2017, because of a disability at least 12 months after the date the member
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Joe Taylor [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 47 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor |
2017-03-13 | House | Representative Taylor J added as cosponsor |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2017-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |