IN SB0080 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that election material related to provisional ballots (excluding the provisional ballots themselves) be made available for copying and inspection under the access to public records law in the same manner as other election material. Provides that information in material related to provisional ballots that identifies an individual, except for the individual's name, address, and birth date, remains confidential.
Title
Public inspection of provisional ballot materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 141 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 560: yeas 93, nays 1 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment | |
2011-01-31 | Senator Lanane added as third author | |
2011-01-31 | Senator Delph added as second author | |
2011-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Richardson | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2011-01-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator M. Young |