IN SB0079 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if motor fuel (fuel) from a retailer is pumped into a vehicle and proper payment is not made to the retailer, the owner of the vehicle is liable to the retailer for the total pump price of the fuel pumped plus a service charge of $50. Provides that: (1) the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) may disclose the name and address of a vehicle owner (owner) to an association of retailers (association) when the information is requested for purposes of contact information in connection with fuel theft; and (2) the name and address may be used only by the association for purposes of collection efforts to recover the price of the fuel and certain other costs. Provides that, if an owner does not pay the total pump price of the fuel pumped plus the service charge within 30 days after the association sends the notice, the owner is also subject to liability to the retailer for other damages, costs, fees, and expenses. Provides that within 30 days after the sending of the retailer's notice, the owner may send a written response to the retailer disputing the retailer's claim or stating that, when the fuel was pumped into the vehicle, the owner was not operating the vehicle and was not responsible for paying for the fuel. Provides that if an owner sends such a response to the retailer, the retailer shall cease communications with the owner but may still seek to recover from the owner by initiating a civil action. Provides that if the owner makes complete payment for the price of fuel that has been pumped into the vehicle and certain other costs, no criminal prosecution for theft or conversion may be brought against the owner for the failure to make proper payment to the motor fuel retailer. Requires the BMV to adopt rules under which an association may obtain the names and mailing addresses of owners from the BMV for purposes of recovering for fuel theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor fuel theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 97
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-25 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 458: yeas 46, nays 4
2011-04-19 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-19 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 559: yeas 83, nays 13
2011-04-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-15 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-04-04 Representative Yarde added as cosponsor
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2011-01-20 Senator Glick added as second author
2011-01-20 Senator Walker added as coauthor
2011-01-20 Cosponsor: Rep. DeLaney
2011-01-20 House sponsor: Rep. Dermody
2011-01-20 Referred to the House
2011-01-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 41 and nays 6
2011-01-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-10 Senators Arnold, Hume and R. Young added as coauthors
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator M. Young

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback