IN SB0075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Bias motivated crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual. Requires law enforcement agencies to report bias motivated crimes to the Federal Bureau of Investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bias motivated crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual. Requires law enforcement agencies to report bias motivated crimes to the Federal Bureau of Investigation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-17SenateSenator Merritt added as third author
2019-01-17SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Glick added as author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Bray removed as author
2019-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback