IN SB0068 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-05 - Bill Withdrawn
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that as an alternative to submission of petitions with voter signatures, a candidate for nomination for President of the United States may pay a fee of $10,000 with the request to be placed on the primary election ballot. Requires a candidate who files a request in this manner to file the request in person. Provides that for the 2012 primary election, the filing deadline for candidates for nomination for President of the United States is noon on March 30 and the date for the election division to certify candidates is April 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualification for presidential primary election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-30 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-24 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-20 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-15 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-09 Bill Withdrawn
2012-06-03 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-28 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-24 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-15 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-10 Bill Withdrawn
2012-05-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-30 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-26 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-21 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-17 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-13 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-09 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-04-01 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-27 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-23 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-14 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-10 Bill Withdrawn
2012-03-05 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-29 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-24 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-19 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-13 Bill Withdrawn
2012-02-06 Bill Withdrawn
2012-01-30 Bill Withdrawn
2012-01-23 Bill Withdrawn
2012-01-10 Senator Delph added as first author
2012-01-10 Senator Long removed as first author
2012-01-10 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Elections
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback