IN SB0063 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community mental health center telemedicine pilot. Establishes a two year community mental health center telemedicine pilot program (program) to be administered by the division of mental health and addiction (division). Provides that the purpose of the program is to provide mental health counseling and services to children through the use of telemedicine. Sets forth requirements for the program and for participation in the program. Requires the reporting of certain information. Allows a provider providing telemedicine services in the program to prescribe any prescription drug except for certain opioids for a patient that is within the provider's scope of practice for
Title
Community mental health center telemedicine pilot. Establishes a two year community mental health center telemedicine pilot program (program) to be administered by the division of mental health and addiction (division). Provides that the purpose of the program is to provide mental health counseling and services to children through the use of telemedicine. Sets forth requirements for the program and for participation in the program. Requires the reporting of certain information. Allows a provider providing telemedicine services in the program to prescribe any prescription drug except for certain opioids for a patient that is within the provider's scope of practice for
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |