IN SB0062 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the expiration dates for the office of the secretary of family and social services, the office of Medicaid policy and planning, the statutes concerning directors of divisions within family and social services (FSSA), and certain advisory committees under the FSSA statutes. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the select joint commission on Medicaid oversight.)
Title
Removal of FSSA expiration dates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | |
2010-01-19 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Miller |