IN SB0060 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of the representation of judges and payment of attorneys fees in judicial mandate actions to an interim study committee.
Title
Representation of judges in mandate of funds litigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 006001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 19 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 329: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Steuerwald added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 139: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |