IN SB0057 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes ballot language. Prescribes the ballot language for the proposed constitutional amendment concerning the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Title
Prescribes ballot language. Prescribes the ballot language for the proposed constitutional amendment concerning the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 20 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2016-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-15 | House | Representative Smith, M. added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Mayfield and Lucas |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Steele added as author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Elections |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |