IN SB0057 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Price added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Price added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts individuals who serve in a reserve component of the armed forces of the United States from jury duty in any court of Indiana. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the commission on military and veterans affairs.)
Title
Military personnel jury service exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-24 - Senate - (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 005701 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 005701 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Price added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Representative Hamm added as sponsor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 39: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Young R. Michael added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Alting added as third author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paul |