IN SB0056 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adds definition of a "research intensive campus". Removes a requirement that all members of the Ball State University board of trustees be residents of Indiana. Removes a requirement that at least one member of the Ball State board of trustees be a resident of Delaware County. Modifies the manner in which alumni members of the Indiana University board of trustees are elected. Allows the board of trustees of Indiana University to hold meetings at the dates, times, and places the board of trustees agrees upon. Repeals a provision concerning emergency appointments to the board of trustees of Indiana University.
Title
Ball State board of trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 92, nays 2 | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Foley added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Speedy | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 48, nays 2 | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Lanane added as second author | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Rogers added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Eckerty |