IN SB0054 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the legislative council to assign to the pension management oversight commission or another appropriate committee the task of studying the status of existing local government unit pension plans, including the participation of local government units in the public employees' retirement fund and the financial effects on participating local government units of withdrawing or excluding new hires from the plans, to determine whether changes are necessary or advisable.
Title
Study of local pension plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 005403 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor - Roll Call 005401 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor - Roll Call 005401 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Representative DeVon added as sponsor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 37: yeas 44 and nays 0 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zakas), prevailed. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as second author. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Pensions and Labor |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |