IN SB0053 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Child seduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child seduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 208
2013-05-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 540: yeas 49, nays 0
2013-04-25HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 609: yeas 98, nays 0
2013-04-25HouseRules suspended
2013-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Morrison and Pierce
2013-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: T. Brown and Hale
2013-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: M. Young, Tallian and Head
2013-04-10SenateSenate conferee appointed: Boots and Stoops
2013-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 338: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2013-01-24SenateCosponsors: Reps. Thompson and Morrison
2013-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2013-01-24SenateReferred to the House
2013-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 47 and nays 0
2013-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-15SenateSenator Randolph added as third author
2013-01-15SenateSenator M. Young added as second author
2013-01-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback