IN SB0052 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Low THC hemp extract. Provides that the Indiana department of state revenue (department) shall revoke a registered retail merchant's certificate if the department finds that the person has been convicted of dealing in marijuana based on the sale of fraudulently labeled low THC hemp extract. Repeals all provisions concerning the cannabidiol registry and a "substance containing cannabidiol" (all added by HEA 1148-2017). Defines "low THC hemp extract" as a product: (1) derived from Cannabis sativa L. that meets the definition of industrial hemp; (2) that contains not more than 0.3% delta-9-THC (including precursors); and (3) that contains no other controlled

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low THC hemp extract. Provides that the Indiana department of state revenue (department) shall revoke a registered retail merchant's certificate if the department finds that the person has been convicted of dealing in marijuana based on the sale of fraudulently labeled low THC hemp extract. Repeals all provisions concerning the cannabidiol registry and a "substance containing cannabidiol" (all added by HEA 1148-2017). Defines "low THC hemp extract" as a product: (1) derived from Cannabis sativa L. that meets the definition of industrial hemp; (2) that contains not more than 0.3% delta-9-THC (including precursors); and (3) that contains no other controlled

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenatePublic Law 153
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 408: yeas 97, nays 0
2018-03-14SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 412: yeas 36, nays 11
2018-03-14HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2018-03-14SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2018-03-07SenateSenator Bray added as advisor
2018-03-05HouseRepresentative Judy added as advisor
2018-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Washburne, Lucas and Hatfield
2018-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Friend and Pierce
2018-03-01SenateSenate advisors appointed: Tomes, Head and Tallian
2018-03-01SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young M and Lanane
2018-03-01SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2018-02-28SenateMotion to dissent filed
2018-02-28HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-02-27HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2018-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 93, nays 0
2018-02-26HouseAmendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-22HouseRepresentative McNamara added as cosponsor
2018-02-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Frizzell added as cosponsor
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Friend added as sponsor
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Frizzell removed as sponsor
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2018-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2018-02-05SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2018-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frizzell
2018-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 35, nays 13
2018-02-01SenateAmendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-01SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2018-02-01SenateAmendment #4 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-29SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2018-01-29SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-01-29SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2018-01-29SenateSenator Tomes added as second author
2018-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-23SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2018-01-11SenateSenator Young M added as author
2018-01-11SenateSenator Long removed as author
2018-01-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/52/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/f/1/84f1bc9e/SB0052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/b/d/f5bd66f1/SB0052.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/9/7/50970b34/SB0052.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/2/e/cb2e7f53/SB0052.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/2/9/47290501/SB0052.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/1/f/b11fb441/SB0052.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/1/2/211232cd/SB0052.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/d/8/8bd88345/SB0052.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/5/1cd5ee57/SB0052.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/6/4/69648b5c/SB0052.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/d/4/9ad4fc52/SB0052.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/a/1/13a1d65f/SB0052.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/0/6a10d137/SB0052.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/5/d/bd5d6be2/SB0052.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/f/f/c5ff67d7/SB0052.126.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/5/a/235a2343/SB0052.04.ENGS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/c/e/96cec48d/SB0052.223.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/0/d/1d0d7514/SB0052.408.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/b/8/f9b842e8/SB0052.412.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback