IN SB0052 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a physician or physician's authorized representative to test an individual for HIV if certain conditions are met unless the individual to be tested refuses to consent to the test. (Current law prohibits a physician from performing the test without the oral or written consent of the individual.) Requires a refusal by an individual to have the test to be documented in the individual's medical record. Requires the physician or authorized representative to: (1) discuss with the patient the availability of counseling concerning the test results; (2) notify the patient of the test results; and (3) inform a patient with a test result indicating that the patient is HIV infected of treatment and referral options available to the patient. Provides that under certain circumstances, a physician may order an HIV test for a patient without informing the patient or despite the individual's refusal of the test. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 321: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 366: yeas 92, nays 1
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-07 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-01 House advisor appointed: Davisson and Welch
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown
2012-02-28 Senate advisor appointed: Miller and Rogers
2012-02-28 Senate conferee appointed: Becker and Breaux
2012-02-27 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-02-20 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 89, nays 6
2012-02-14 Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-09 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2012-01-19 Senator Wyss added as coauthor
2012-01-19 Cosponsors: Reps. C. Brown and Crouch
2012-01-19 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2012-01-19 Referred to the House
2012-01-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 48 and nays 0
2012-01-17 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-12 Senator Rogers added as coauthor
2012-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-10 Senator Breaux added as coauthor
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-01-04 Authored by Senators Becker and Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback