IN SB0051 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires, before September 1, 2014, the state department of health to: (1) adopt rules concerning the regulation of facilities for treatment of traumatic brain injuries; and (2) make recommendations to the legislative council and health finance commission concerning food handling law changes. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)
Title
Department of health matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 005101 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 005101 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Representative Bacon added as sponsor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 11: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Patricia |