IN SB0048 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State educational institution information. Requires a state educational institution to prominently display hyperlinks to certain college scorecard information on the state educational institution's website and degree web pages.
Title
State educational institution information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 11 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as coauthor |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Behning, Davis, Speedy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Teshka |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senator Hunley added as coauthor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as coauthor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senators Crider, Charbonneau, Walker K added as coauthors |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senators Deery, Donato, Bassler, Johnson T, Zay, Buchanan added as coauthors |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senators Walker G, Messmer, Holdman, Buck, Niezgodski, Koch added as coauthors |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senators Baldwin, Bohacek, Tomes, Byrne, Crane added as coauthors |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senator Garten added as third author |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senators Goode G and Rogers added as coauthors |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senator Dernulc added as coauthor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senator Alexander added as coauthor |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |