IN SB0042 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 105: yeas 9, nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Local government budgets. Prohibits a county, city, town, or townships (unit) from reducing its annual public safety budget for the ensuing fiscal year by an amount that is more than the percentage by which the anticipated revenue for the ensuing budget year is less than the anticipated revenue in the current budget year. Provides that a unit may not transfer more than 5% of the funds appropriated to the public safety budget to a non-public safety purpose, unless the executive declares that an emergency exists and the transfer is necessary to protect the public health, welfare, or safety. Exempts public safety budget reductions that are the result of a reorganization of a unit under the government modernization act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government budgets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 9 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15SenateThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 105: yeas 9, nays 37
2021-02-11SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/42/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/7/1/8a717570/SB0042.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/2/1/31211645/SB0042.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/b/b/fabbd291/SB0042.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/0/c/280cdfc4/SB0042.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/e/7/a7e7cdbe/SB0042.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/0/3/7d034838/SB0042.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/b/d5fbd8a1/SB0042.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/9/d/b39de0e5/SB0042.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/c/b/69cb21e6/SB0042.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/1/c/fb1cb3f3/SB0042.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/d/8/89d814c0/SB0042.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/0/2/2002aa80/SB0042.105_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback