IN SB0039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specialized driving privileges. Provides that in certain circumstances a court may stay the suspension of a person's driving privileges and grant specialized driving privileges for a period of time as determined by the court. Provides that the court may set periodic hearings to review the grant of specialized driving privileges. Provides that, if a probable cause affidavit must be sent by a judicial officer to the bureau of motor vehicles, the probable cause affidavit must be sent at the conclusion of the initial hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialized driving privileges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenatePublic Law 29
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 48, nays 1
2020-03-03SenateMotion to concur filed
2020-02-24SenateSenators Bohacek and Taylor G added as coauthors
2020-02-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 93, nays 2
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-15SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-14SenateSenator Merritt added as third author
2020-01-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Young J
2020-01-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-01-13SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-13SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-09SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2020-01-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/39/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/d/5/48d5b639/SB0039.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/9/9/7e99b0c1/SB0039.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/0/c/470c6690/SB0039.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/2/f/e62f299e/SB0039.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/f/e/d9feaa3b/SB0039.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/6/3/8263f60e/SB0039.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/b/5/11b5b235/SB0039.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/e/f/30ef0606/SB0039.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/9/d/399d28ef/SB0039.14_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/6/e096e82a/SB0039.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/7/a/e97af997/SB0039.185_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/9/2/19920c9c/SB0039.325_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback