IN SB0035 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Vigo County food and beverage tax. Authorizes the county council of Vigo County to adopt a county food and beverage tax (tax). Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Specifies that the revenue from the tax shall be distributed to the capital improvement board and may be used by the board only for the acquisition, construction, improvement, maintenance, or financing of the following: (1) A convention center. (2) A facility that is used or will be used principally for convention or tourism related events or the arts. (3) Wayfinding improvements. Requires the construction or improvements to be made

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vigo County food and beverage tax. Authorizes the county council of Vigo County to adopt a county food and beverage tax (tax). Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Specifies that the revenue from the tax shall be distributed to the capital improvement board and may be used by the board only for the acquisition, construction, improvement, maintenance, or financing of the following: (1) A convention center. (2) A facility that is used or will be used principally for convention or tourism related events or the arts. (3) Wayfinding improvements. Requires the construction or improvements to be made

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-01-30SenateReferred to the House
2018-01-29SenateCosponsors: Representatives Heaton, Baird and Kersey
2018-01-29SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Morrison
2018-01-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 41, nays 8
2018-01-25SenateSenator Randolph added as second author
2018-01-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-16SenateSenator Ford added as author
2018-01-16SenateSenator Long removed as author
2018-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback