IN SB0032 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a minor who has not been adjudicated an incapacitated person and the minor's guardian to jointly petition the court to extend the guardianship beyond the date the minor attains 18 years of age. Requires the petition to be verified. Authorizes the court to extend the guardianship, but not beyond the date on which the protected person attains 22 years of age, if the court finds that extending the guardianship is in the best interests of the protected person. Specifies that the extension of the guardianship does not place the person under a legal disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 384: yeas 92, nays 0
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 329: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-08 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-06 House advisors appointed: Leonard and DeLaney
2012-03-06 House conferees appointed: Foley and Pryor
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Head, Randolph and Delph
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Broden
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-05 Concurrence withdrawn
2012-02-29 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-02-20 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 95, nays 0
2012-02-16 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-23 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2012-01-23 Referred to the House
2012-01-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-19 Senator Broden added as second author
2012-01-17 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback