IN SB0029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent domain. Increases the compensation paid in the case of a condemnation taking a fee simple interest in property from the property's fair market value to at least 120% of the fair market value of the property.
Title
Eminent domain.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Goodrich |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 40, nays 7 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Pol) failed; voice vote |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |