IN SB0028 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical malpractice. Increases the amount of recoverable damages for injury or death to a patient. Increases health care provider liability limits. Defines "final nonappealable judgment." Specifies that claims from the patient's compensation fund must be paid not later than 60 days after the issuance of a court approved settlement or final nonappealable judgment. Increases amounts paid to: (1) health care provider members; and (2) the chairman; of the medical review panel. Provides that attorney fees may not exceed 32% of the total recovery. Adds anesthesiologist assistants to the definition of health care providers for purposes of the law concerning medical

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical malpractice. Increases the amount of recoverable damages for injury or death to a patient. Increases health care provider liability limits. Defines "final nonappealable judgment." Specifies that claims from the patient's compensation fund must be paid not later than 60 days after the issuance of a court approved settlement or final nonappealable judgment. Increases amounts paid to: (1) health care provider members; and (2) the chairman; of the medical review panel. Provides that attorney fees may not exceed 32% of the total recovery. Adds anesthesiologist assistants to the definition of health care providers for purposes of the law concerning medical

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 182
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-08SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 362: yeas 49, nays 0
2016-03-08SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2016-03-07SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2016-03-04SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-03-04HouseRepresentative Torr added as cosponsor
2016-03-04HouseRepresentative Lehman added as cosponsor
2016-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-03HouseThird reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 364: yeas 90, nays 5
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #2 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #8 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #7 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #4 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2016-02-01SenateCosponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Koch
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-28SenateSenator Head added as second author
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/28/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/0/f/2c0fc0cf/SB0028.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/b/c/60bcbb77/SB0028.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/2/b/fe2b49a2/SB0028.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/7/c/687c3a9a/SB0028.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/b/3/c0b37f58/SB0028.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/a/f/cbaff05c/SB0028.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/2/4/0f242a43/SB0028.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/d/3/76d3afc3/SB0028.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/4/2/1b42f0cd/SB0028.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/b/f/f6bf26c8/SB0028.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/7/d/977d41a7/SB0028.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/5/0/83503051/SB0028.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/6/d/896d38ee/SB0028.73.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/c/b/a1cb5e1e/SB0028.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/2/d/ca2de4b5/SB0028.364.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/4/3/2243912a/SB0028.362.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback