IN SB0027 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits granting an adoption while certain appeals are pending. Provides that the court in which a petition for adoption has been filed has exclusive jurisdiction over the child if there is a petition for adoption and a paternity action pending at the same time. (Current law provides exclusive jurisdiction when there is a petition for adoption and a petition for paternity pending.) Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee the task of studying whether a father who has abandoned a birth mother during pregnancy should be required to consent to the adoption of the child. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the commission on courts.)
Title
Petitions for adoption.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Richard Bray [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 002702 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 002701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 002702 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 002701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 81 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 347: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 271: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Kubacki added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 27 Amendment #1 (Richardson), prevailed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Richardson added first sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Bray added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas, Steele, Broden |