IN SB0026 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Organizes definitions in Title 35. Makes technical corrections. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the criminal code evaluation commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title 35 definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-10 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 383: yeas 89, nays 2
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 328: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-08 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-01 House advisor appointed: Koch and Pryor
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: Foley and Pierce
2012-02-29 Senate advisor appointed: Glick and Hume
2012-02-29 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Randolph
2012-02-29 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-02-20 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 90, nays 2
2012-02-16 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-23 Cosponsor: Rep. Pierce
2012-01-23 House sponsor: Rep. Foley
2012-01-23 Referred to the House
2012-01-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-19 Senator Hume added as second author
2012-01-17 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2012-01-17 Amendment 1 (Bray), prevailed;
2012-01-17 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback