IN SB0021 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Obsolete statutes. Repeals or expires various provisions in the Indiana Code containing the following: (1) Reporting requirements that have been completed, including the following: (A) A 2013 report by the commission for higher education concerning study and evaluation of postsecondary education issues. (B) A 2008 plan for a display commemorating black citizens. (C) A 2008 plan for a bust of Benjamin Harrison. (D) A 2012 report concerning 911 and enhanced 911. (E) A 2011 report concerning the auditor of state progress in complying with requirement for state agency access to financial data. (F) A 2011 report on commission for higher

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obsolete statutes. Repeals or expires various provisions in the Indiana Code containing the following: (1) Reporting requirements that have been completed, including the following: (A) A 2013 report by the commission for higher education concerning study and evaluation of postsecondary education issues. (B) A 2008 plan for a display commemorating black citizens. (C) A 2008 plan for a bust of Benjamin Harrison. (D) A 2012 report concerning 911 and enhanced 911. (E) A 2011 report concerning the auditor of state progress in complying with requirement for state agency access to financial data. (F) A 2011 report on commission for higher

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23SenatePublic Law 121
2016-03-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2016-03-10SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2016-02-29HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-02-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-02-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-18HouseRepresentative Stemler added as cosponsor
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
2016-01-20SenateReferred to the House
2016-01-19SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-01-19SenateSenators Raatz and Perfect added as coauthors
2016-01-19SenateCosponsors: Representatives VanNatter and Baird
2016-01-19SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Price
2016-01-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senators Bray and Breaux

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/21/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/9/1/a491db40/SB0021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/0/2/9702d7f7/SB0021.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/d/7/a1d7c51d/SB0021.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/d/9/eed91f08/SB0021.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/1/fd61604e/SB0021.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/2/4/6c241ab2/SB0021.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/8/c/c28cf256/SB0021.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/c/53bc2c54/SB0021.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/4/4/f344c724/SB0021.15.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/3/0/27305ca8/SB0021.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/4/f/8c4ff3a0/SB0021.270.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback