IN SB0020 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce policies. Provides that a local governmental unit may not establish, mandate, or otherwise require an employer to provide to an employee who is employed within the jurisdiction of the unit a scheduling policy that exceeds the requirements of federal or state law, rules, or regulations, unless federal or state law provides otherwise. Provides that an attorney who represents an employer, an employing unit, or a claimant in a claim for unemployment benefits (benefits) pending before an administrative law judge, the review board, or another individual who adjudicates claims must be: (1) an attorney in good standing admitted to the
Title
Workforce policies. Provides that a local governmental unit may not establish, mandate, or otherwise require an employer to provide to an employee who is employed within the jurisdiction of the unit a scheduling policy that exceeds the requirements of federal or state law, rules, or regulations, unless federal or state law provides otherwise. Provides that an attorney who represents an employer, an employing unit, or a claimant in a claim for unemployment benefits (benefits) pending before an administrative law judge, the review board, or another individual who adjudicates claims must be: (1) an attorney in good standing admitted to the
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Timothy Harman [R] |
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pelath) failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pelath) failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 120 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 425: yeas 72, nays 24 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Lyness added as conferee |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Lyness removed as advisor |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Moseley removed as conferee |
2016-02-29 | House | House advisors appointed: Lyness, Austin and DeLaney |
2016-02-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Ober and Moseley |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Walker and Arnold J |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Wesco added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 69, nays 22 |
2016-02-18 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 196: yeas 28, nays 66 |
2016-02-18 | House | Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 195: yeas 28, nays 65 |
2016-02-18 | House | Amendment #4 (Austin) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-18 | House | Amendment #1 (Pelath) failed; Roll Call 194: yeas 35, nays 59 |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Gutwein added as cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Harman added as sponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Gutwein removed as sponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Gutwein |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |