IN SB0019 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representatives Heaton, Judy, Olthoff added as cosponsors
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Required information on student ID cards. Requires a public school that issues, after June 30, 2022, a student identification card to a student in grade 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, or 12 to include on the student identification card a local, state, or national: (1) suicide prevention hotline telephone number; and (2) human trafficking hotline telephone number; that provides support 24 hours a day, seven days a week. Provides that the information may be printed on the student identification card or printed on a sticker that is affixed to the student identification card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required information on student ID cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseRepresentatives Heaton, Judy, Olthoff added as cosponsors
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative DeVon
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 35, nays 12
2021-02-01SenateSenator Walker K added as coauthor
2021-02-01SenateAmendment #2 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-25SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Grooms added as third author
2021-01-14SenateSenator Yoder S added as coauthor
2021-01-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senators Ford Jon and Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/19/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/9/3/4893fa83/SB0019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/b/a/93ba8e59/SB0019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/c/f/10cff077/SB0019.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/d/7/b1d70156/SB0019.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/5/f/fb5f0b43/SB0019.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/5/f/545fc27c/SB0019.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/9/2/cd92b1ba/SB0019.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/5/8/f158edd6/SB0019.02.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/e/b/ddeba81c/SB0019.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/4/8/d848c13e/SB0019.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/f/1/c3f16f25/SB0019.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/b/e/a6be3470/SB0019.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/5/8/8b587622/SB0019.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/f/5/faf5ece0/SB0019.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/e/7/9de7865d/SB0019.37_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback