IN SB0014 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Senator Messmer added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms matters. Makes the current offense of carrying a handgun without a license applicable only to persons who are at least 18 years of age but less than 21 years of age. Allows certain persons who are at least 21 years of age to possess or carry a handgun without a license unless the person fits into one of several categories, including a person who: (1) has been convicted of, or arrested for, specified crimes or delinquent offenses; (2) has been prohibited by a court from possessing a handgun or has been found by a court to be dangerous; or (3) has been found by a court to be mentally incompetent, has been involuntarily committed, or has been the subject of a 90 day or regular commitment. Allows certain persons who: (1) do not meet the requirements to receive a license to carry a handgun; and (2) are not otherwise barred from carrying or possessing a handgun by state law; to carry a handgun in specified instances. Makes it a Class A misdemeanor for particular persons to possess or carry a handgun. Increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony in some instances. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments and repeals obsolete provisions. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateSenator Messmer added as coauthor
2022-01-18SenateSenators Gaskill and Sandlin added as coauthors
2022-01-12SenateSenator Niemeyer added as coauthor
2022-01-12SenateSenators Freeman and Koch added as coauthors
2022-01-11SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2022-01-11SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2022-01-04SenateSenator Baldwin added as coauthor
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senators Tomes, Brown L, Doriot

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback