IN SB0012 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sex offenders. Provides that, unless a court has granted a waiver, a sex offender who establishes a residence: (1) with the intent to reside at the residence; (2) within a one mile radius of the residence of the victim of the offender's sex offense; and (3) knowing the location of the victim's residence; commits invasion of privacy. Prohibits a sex offender from attending a house of worship located on school property while classes, extracurricular activities, or other school activities are being held.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offenders. Provides that, unless a court has granted a waiver, a sex offender who establishes a residence: (1) with the intent to reside at the residence; (2) within a one mile radius of the residence of the victim of the offender's sex offense; and (3) knowing the location of the victim's residence; commits invasion of privacy. Prohibits a sex offender from attending a house of worship located on school property while classes, extracurricular activities, or other school activities are being held.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenatePublic Law 87
2018-03-16SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-12SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 370: yeas 26, nays 20
2018-03-08SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-03-08SenateSenator Houchin removed as second author
2018-02-28HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 91, nays 0
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2018-02-07SenateReferred to the House
2018-02-06SenateSenators Alting and Crider added as coauthors
2018-02-06SenateCosponsor: Representative Pressel
2018-02-06SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Negele
2018-02-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 46, nays 0
2018-02-05SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-02-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-22SenateSenators Eckerty and Crane added as coauthors
2018-01-03SenateSenator Houchin added as second author
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/12/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/3/0/8830ee6b/SB0012.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/8/2/7182d336/SB0012.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/6/9/a769e4b7/SB0012.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/0/0/c9005631/SB0012.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/7/9/5f79d15f/SB0012.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/7/f/777f1e54/SB0012.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/3/1/a5316e2a/SB0012.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/3/d/473d1404/SB0012.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/7/6/b6766fea/SB0012.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/4/e/3f4e3445/SB0012.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/f/4/9cf436d2/SB0012.153.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/e/d/12eda450/SB0012.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/f/2/d8f23a1e/SB0012.222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/2/f/fd2f240b/SB0012.370.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback