IN SB0012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reestablishes the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) and other divisions and offices within FSSA. Removes certain emergency rule making authority previously authorized for the office concerning federal programs administered by the office. Adds emergency rule making authority for the office to comply with the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Makes technical corrections. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)
Title
Reestablishment of FSSA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Clere | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 44 and nays 6 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (Breaux), failed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed; Roll Call 91: yeas 13, nays 37 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 2 (Miller), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-12 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Miller |