IN SB0010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coroner and conflict of interest. Requires a coroner to obtain the services of the coroner of another county if the coroner believes that he or she has a conflict of interest. Provides that the coroner of the other county shall be reimbursed for all costs incurred in the case by the county in which the conflict of interest exists.
Title
Coroner and conflict of interest. Requires a coroner to obtain the services of the coroner of another county if the coroner believes that he or she has a conflict of interest. Provides that the coroner of the other county shall be reimbursed for all costs incurred in the case by the county in which the conflict of interest exists.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. John Broden [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Casey Cox [R] |
Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Public Law 42 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-30 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Representative Cox added as cosponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | Representative Bacon added as sponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | Representative Cox removed as sponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Representative Cox added as sponsor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Head added as third author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele |