IN SB0008 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Forfeiture. Establishes a new procedure for civil forfeiture, and treats seized property in which a person asserts an ownership interest differently from seized property that is abandoned or unclaimed. Permits seized property that is not abandoned or unclaimed to be forfeited to the state only if the person who owned or used the property has been convicted of a criminal offense. Establishes procedures by which a property owner may regain custody of seized property pending a final determination of the forfeiture action. Repeals a provision permitting the state to turn over seized property to the federal government. Makes conforming amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture. Establishes a new procedure for civil forfeiture, and treats seized property in which a person asserts an ownership interest differently from seized property that is abandoned or unclaimed. Permits seized property that is not abandoned or unclaimed to be forfeited to the state only if the person who owned or used the property has been convicted of a criminal offense. Establishes procedures by which a property owner may regain custody of seized property pending a final determination of the forfeiture action. Repeals a provision permitting the state to turn over seized property to the federal government. Makes conforming amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateCosponsor: Representative VanNatter
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Torr
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 40, nays 10
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-17SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-12SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2017-01-04SenateSenator Young, M. added as second author
2017-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback