IN SB0007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abandoned mobile homes. Makes changes to the procedure in current law for the sale or salvage of an abandoned mobile home located on private property, other than mobile homes located in a mobile home community. Provides, except in the case of an abandoned mobile home offered for sale at auction, that the bureau of motor vehicles may not transfer the title to a mobile home or change the names on the title to a mobile home unless the owner holds a valid permit issued by the county treasurer. Provides that a permit to move, or transfer title to, a mobile
Title
Abandoned mobile homes. Makes changes to the procedure in current law for the sale or salvage of an abandoned mobile home located on private property, other than mobile homes located in a mobile home community. Provides, except in the case of an abandoned mobile home offered for sale at auction, that the bureau of motor vehicles may not transfer the title to a mobile home or change the names on the title to a mobile home unless the owner holds a valid permit issued by the county treasurer. Provides that a permit to move, or transfer title to, a mobile
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Casey Cox [R] |
Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 71 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 384: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 344: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2015-03-30 | House | Representative Brown, C. added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Cox added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele. |