IN HJR0003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senator Alexander added as second sponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senator Alexander added as second sponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Terms of US Senators and members of Congress. Terms of US Senators and members of Congress. Applies to Congress for a Convention for proposing Amendments under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to provide limits to the number of terms that an individual may serve in the United States House of Representatives and in the United States Senate.
Title
Terms of US Senators and members of Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hall [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Kyle Miller [D] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Scott Alexander [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senator Alexander added as second sponsor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 63, nays 32 |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-22 | House | Representative Miller K added as coauthor |
2024-01-22 | House | Representative Miller D removed as coauthor |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2024-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Jeter, Karickhoff, Miller D |