IN HCR0045 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Indiana Task Force One.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Indiana Task Force One.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateReturned to the House
2021-04-20SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2021-04-13HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-04-13HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback